Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvino Martínez

Deceased

Bishop of Rosario, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1898Born
19 Mar 192122.5Ordained PriestPriest of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
7 Oct 194648.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rosario, Argentina
7 Oct 194648.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Canatha
21 Dec 194648.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canatha
23 Oct 195456.1AppointedBishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos, Argentina
29 Oct 195557.1InstalledBishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos, Argentina
21 Sep 195961.0AppointedBishop of Rosario, Argentina
12 Dec 195961.2InstalledBishop of Rosario, Argentina
27 Jan 196162.3DiedBishop of Rosario, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Silvino Martínez
Bishop Silvino Martínez (born , died ) Bishop of Rosario

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeñaranda de Duero, Spain
Ordained BishopRosario, Diocese of Rosario

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1946, Number 111
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 35, Number 2,113
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast