Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos María Cafferata

Deceased

Bishop of San Luis, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1908Born
19 Dec 194234.1Ordained PriestPriest of Rosario, Argentina
22 May 195647.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rosario, Argentina
22 May 195647.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Europa
24 Aug 195647.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Europa
11 Jul 196152.7AppointedBishop of San Luis, Argentina
30 Sep 196152.9InstalledBishop of San Luis, Argentina
6 Jul 197162.6DiedBishop of San Luis, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Carlos María Cafferata
Bishop Carlos María Cafferata (born , died ) Bishop of San Luis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRosario, Diocese of Rosario
Ordained BishopCathedral, Rosario, Diocese of Rosario

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 73
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,240
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast