Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Camillo Cardinal Ruini

Vicar General Emeritus of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1931 Born
8 Dec 195423.8Ordained PriestPriest of Reggio Emilia, Italy
16 May 198352.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
16 May 198352.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Nepte
29 Jun 198352.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nepte
28 Jun 198655.3AppointedSecretary General of the Italian Episcopal Conference
17 Jan 199159.9AppointedVicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy
17 Jan 199159.9AppointedPro-Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
17 Jan 199159.9AppointedPresident of the Italian Episcopal Conference
28 Jun 199160.3Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 199160.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
1 Jul 199160.3AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
7 Mar 200776.0CeasedPresident of the Italian Episcopal Conference
27 Jun 200877.3RetiredVicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy
27 Jun 200877.3RetiredArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}

MicroData Summary for Camillo Ruini
(VIAF: 24648299; WikiData: Q505206)
Camillo Cardinal Ruini (born ) Vicar General Emeritus of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassuolo, Diocese of Reggio Emilia
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Assunta, Cathedral, Reggio Emilia, Diocese of Reggio Emilia

Please contact the Cardinal through the Diocese of Roma {Rome}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,740
  • opd/loc: AM, 28 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024