Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Petrus Canisius Mandagi, M.S.C.

Archbishop of Merauke, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1949 Born
18 Dec 197526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
10 Jun 199445.1AppointedBishop of Amboina, Indonesia
18 Sep 199445.3Ordained BishopBishop of Amboina, Indonesia
7 Aug 201970.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Merauke, Indonesia
11 Nov 202071.5AppointedArchbishop of Merauke, Indonesia
3 Jan 202171.6InstalledArchbishop of Merauke, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Petrus Canisius Mandagi
Archbishop Petrus Canisius Mandagi M.S.C. (born ) Archbishop of Merauke

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKamangta
Ordained BishopSalles des sports, Amboina, Diocese of Amboina

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Merauke.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,438
  • mera: CB, 13 Aug 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2020
  • i: AM, 17 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 18 Jan 2021

Quantcast