Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Francis Maguire

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1919Born
29 Jun 194525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
1 Dec 197152.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
1 Dec 197152.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mactaris
2 Feb 197252.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mactaris
13 Apr 197656.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
15 Oct 197758.1SucceededBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
27 Dec 199172.3RetiredBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
23 Nov 201495.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Francis Maguire
Bishop Joseph Francis Maguire (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Springfield in Massachusetts

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoston, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Ordained BishopHoly Cross, Cathedral, Boston, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts

  • a priest for 69.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 23 Nov 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 909
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,273
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 28 Nov 2020

Quantcast