Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Magaña, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Solsona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1658²Born
10 May 171759.3AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
11 Jul 171759.5Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
9 Feb 171860.1DiedBishop of Solsona, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Magaña
Bishop Pedro Magaña O.S.B. (born 1658, died ) Bishop of Solsona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlfaro
Ordained BishopMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 35, Number 113
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 153
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,526
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,973

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast