Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ronald Ignacio (Bong) Lunas

Bishop of Pagadian, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1966 Born
9 Nov 199124.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Digos, Philippines
7 Apr 199225.3Ordained PriestPriest of Digos, Philippines
22 Nov 201851.9AppointedBishop of Pagadian, Philippines
11 Feb 201952.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pagadian, Philippines
25 Mar 201952.3InstalledBishop of Pagadian, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Ronald Ignacio (Bong) Lunas
Bishop Ronald Ignacio (Bong) Lunas (born ) Bishop of Pagadian

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBala, Magsaysay, Diocese of Digos
Ordained BishopMary Mediatrix of All Grace, Cathedral, Digos City, Diocese of Digos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pagadian.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2018
  • c01/od: CB, 22 Nov 2018
  • ob: CB, 10 Dec 2018
  • i: CB, 24 Dec 2018
  • c2+: CB, 14 Jan 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast