Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Celestino Loza

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1864Born
13 Aug 188824.2Ordained PriestPriest of La Paz, Bolivia
20 Jun 192056.0AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
10 Oct 192056.3Ordained BishopBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
18 Jan 192156.6DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Celestino Loza
Bishop Celestino Loza (born , died ) Bishop of La Paz

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuerto Acosta
Ordained BishopLa Paz, Diocese of La Paz

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1920, Number 60
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,832

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast