Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wayne Lawrence Lobsinger

Auxiliary Bishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada

Titular Bishop of Gemellae in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1966 Born
7 May 199427.4Ordained PriestPriest of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
21 Nov 202053.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
21 Nov 202053.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Numidia
18 Apr 202154.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Numidia

MicroData Summary for Wayne Lawrence Lobsinger
Bishop Wayne Lawrence Lobsinger (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Hamilton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKitchener, Diocese of Hamilton, Ontario
Ordained PriestChrist the King, Cathedral, Hamilton, Diocese of Hamilton, Ontario
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral Basilica, Hamilton, Diocese of Hamilton, Ontario

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hamilton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2020
  • ob/c1: CB, 21 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Apr 2021

Quantcast