Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de La Puente, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1779Born
14 Aug 179617.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Mar 184666.9SelectedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
27 Jul 184667.3ConfirmedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
28 Oct 184667.5Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
14 Feb 184868.8SelectedBishop of Segovia, Spain
3 Jul 184869.2ConfirmedBishop of Segovia, Spain
15 Nov 185475.6DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de La Puente
Bishop Francisco de La Puente O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaldaña
Ordained BishopMadrid

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,707
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 464, and Page 509
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 151, Number 826
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1846, Number 37
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,732

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast