Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Lago y González

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1865Born
26 May 188822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tuy, Spain
25 Aug 190943.8AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
3 Apr 191044.4Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
4 May 191751.5AppointedBishop of Tuy, Spain
24 Jul 192357.7AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
18 Mar 192559.3DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Lago y González
Archbishop Manuel Lago y González (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuy

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1910, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast