Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulo Dionisio Lachovicz (Liakhovych), O.S.B.M.

Apostolic Exarch of Italy, Faithful of the Ukrainian Catholic Church (Ukrainian)

Note/Previous Titular See: (Apostolic Visitor/Uk/Italy and Spain)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1946 Born
30 Jan 196417.5First VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
30 Mar 197023.7Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1972²25.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
8 Dec 197226.4Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
21 Dec 200559.4AppointedCurial Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
21 Dec 200559.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Egnatia
26 Feb 200659.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Egnatia
19 Jan 200962.5ResignedCurial Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
5 Sep 201973.1AppointedApostolic Delegate of Italy, Faithful of the Ukrainian Catholic Church (Ukrainian)
24 Oct 202074.3AppointedApostolic Exarch of Italy, Faithful of the Ukrainian Catholic Church (Ukrainian)
1 Dec 202074.4InstalledApostolic Exarch of Italy, Faithful of the Ukrainian Catholic Church (Ukrainian)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paulo Dionisio Lachovicz (Liakhovych)
Bishop Paulo Dionisio Lachovicz (Liakhovych) O.S.B.M. (born ) Apostolic Exarch of Italy, Faithful of the Ukrainian Catholic Church

EventPlace
Birth PlacePombas, Eparchy of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian), Brazil
Ordained BishopSão Josafat, Church, Prudentópolis, Brazil

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Exarchate of Italy, Faithful of the Ukrainian Catholic Church (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,079
  • c0/firs: CB, 20 Apr 2017
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2020
  • i/bpd: AM, 29 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 30 Nov 2020

Quantcast