Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Koaik

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1926Born
8 Apr 195023.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Oct 197347.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
22 Oct 197347.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Noba
6 Jan 197447.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Noba
30 Nov 197953.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Jan 198457.3SucceededBishop of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
15 May 200275.7RetiredBishop of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Aug 201286.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Koaik
Bishop Eduardo Koaik (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Piracicaba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManaus
Ordained BishopOld, Cathedral, Rio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 25 Aug 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,301
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,411
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 26, Number 1,480

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast