Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Kłokocki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz), Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Sidyma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1733Born
176127.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 179562.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz), Ukraine
22 Sep 179562.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidyma
Aug 1798³65.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidyma
8 Mar 180875.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adam Kłokocki
Bishop Adam Kłokocki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIvensi
Ordained BishopVilius, Diocese of Vilnius, Lithuania

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 380, and Page 454
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 35
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,711

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast