Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Anatole Kalala Kaseba

Bishop Emeritus of Kamina, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1947 Born
25 Sep 197629.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 199042.9AppointedBishop of Kamina, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Jun 199043.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kamina, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 Dec 202073.8ResignedBishop of Kamina, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Jean-Anatole Kalala Kaseba
Bishop Jean-Anatole Kalala Kaseba (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kamina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuala
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kamina, Diocese of Kamina

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kamina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,286
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 3 Dec 2020

Quantcast