Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Leopold Kaiser

Deceased

Bishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1788Born
21 Mar 181223.3Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
182132.1IncardinatedPriest of Mainz, Germany
16 Oct 183445.9SelectedBishop of Mainz, Germany
6 Apr 183546.4ConfirmedBishop of Mainz, Germany
30 Jun 183546.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mainz, Germany
30 Dec 184860.1DiedBishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Peter Leopold Kaiser (VIAF: 49965910)
Bishop Peter Leopold Kaiser (born , died ) Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMühlheim, Diocese of Mainz
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mainz, Diocese of Mainz

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 268
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1835, Number 23
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast