Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter William Ingham

Bishop Emeritus of Wollongong, Australia

Apostolic Visitor (Visitator) of Broome


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1941 Born
18 Jul 196423.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
24 May 199352.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
24 May 199352.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Pudentiana
12 Jul 199352.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pudentiana
6 Jun 200160.3AppointedBishop of Wollongong, Australia
25 Jul 200160.5InstalledBishop of Wollongong, Australia
30 Nov 201776.8RetiredBishop of Wollongong, Australia
10 Mar 202079.1AppointedApostolic Visitor (Visitator) of Broome, Australia

MicroData Summary for Peter William Ingham
Bishop Peter William Ingham (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Wollongong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSydney, Archdiocese of Sydney
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sydney, Archdiocese of Sydney

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wollongong.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,120
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 28 Nov 2020

Quantcast