Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stephen Sulyk

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1924Born
7 Jun 195126.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of United States of America (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania
14 Jun 195227.6Ordained PriestPriest of United States of America (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania
29 Dec 198056.2AppointedArchbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
1 Mar 198156.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
29 Nov 200076.1RetiredArchbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
6 Apr 202095.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Stephen Sulyk
Archbishop Stephen Sulyk (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Philadelphia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBalnica (Lesko), Ukraine
Ordained BishopS. Sofia, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceVirtua, Hospital, Voorhees, NJ
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Immaculate Conception, Cathedral, Philadelphia, Archeparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 67.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd: CB, 3 Oct 2014
  • od/c0: CB, 19 Jun 2015
  • d: CB, 6 Apr 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,191
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 87, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast