Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Scheifes

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

Titular Bishop of Cestrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1863Born
17 Dec 188724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
7 Mar 192158.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
7 Mar 192158.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cestrus
24 Apr 192158.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cestrus
30 Oct 193673.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Scheifes
Bishop Johannes Scheifes (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAldekirk

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1921, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast