Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvio Luis Haro Alvear

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ibarra, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1904Born
29 Jun 192924.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 195045.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
17 Jul 195045.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Antaeopolis
8 Oct 195045.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antaeopolis
23 Mar 195550.2AppointedBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
28 Jun 198075.5RetiredBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
28 May 198378.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Ibarra, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Silvio Luis Haro Alvear
Bishop Silvio Luis Haro Alvear (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ibarra

EventPlace
Birth PlacePueblo de Penipe

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1950, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast