Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juán Maria Riofrio, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Loja, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1905Born
29 Jul 192923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
10 Oct 195650.9AppointedBishop of Loja, Ecuador
8 Dec 195651.0Ordained BishopBishop of Loja, Ecuador
24 Jun 196357.6DiedBishop of Loja, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Juán Maria Riofrio
Bishop Juán Maria Riofrio O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Loja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoja

  • a priest for 33.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 109

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast