Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Maria Grassi, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1887Born
19 Feb 191022.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 191427.2ProfessedPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
13 Mar 193346.0AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
1 May 193346.1Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
11 Jun 193346.2InstalledBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
5 Apr 194861.0DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria Grassi
Bishop Luigi Maria Grassi B. (born , died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMondovi

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1949
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1933, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast