Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Fernando González Mariño

Bishop of Espinal, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1966 Born
1 Aug 199832.5Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Marta, Colombia
11 Feb 201650.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ibagué, Colombia
11 Feb 201650.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Boseta
12 Mar 201650.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Boseta
21 Mar 201953.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ibagué, Colombia
19 Jul 202054.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Ibagué, Colombia
19 Dec 202054.9AppointedBishop of Espinal, Colombia
6 Feb 202155.0InstalledBishop of Espinal, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Miguel Fernando González Mariño
Bishop Miguel Fernando González Mariño (born ) Bishop of Espinal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTunja
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Santa Marta, Diocese of Santa Marta

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Espinal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 25 Feb 2016
  • c3+: CB, 11 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,859
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2020
  • i: CB, 3 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Feb 2021

Quantcast