Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Adriano Piedrahíta Sandoval

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1946Born
29 Oct 197226.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cali, Colombia
19 Jul 199952.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cali, Colombia
19 Jul 199952.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Centenaria
8 Sep 199952.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centenaria
3 Jul 200760.7AppointedBishop of Apartadó, Colombia
5 Aug 201467.8AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
11 Jan 202174.2DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luis Adriano Piedrahíta Sandoval
Bishop Luis Adriano Piedrahíta Sandoval (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalmira
Ordained BishopSan Pedro Apóstol, Cathedral, Cali, Archdiocese of Cali
Death PlaceAdivanti Clinic, Santa Marta, Diocese of Santa Marta

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,604
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Aug 2014
  • d: CB, 11 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Feb 2021

Quantcast