Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Gili

Deceased

Bishop of Cesena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1886Born
28 Jun 190822.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 194660.1AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
14 Jul 194660.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena, Italy
30 Nov 195468.8DiedBishop of Cesena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Gili
Bishop Vincenzo Gili (born , died ) Bishop of Cesena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarignano

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1946, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast