Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín Gómez Cabezas y Sildo

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1795Born
24 Jun 182428.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 Sep 185560.0SelectedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
19 Jan 185660.3ConfirmedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
18 Jan 185761.3Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
1862¹66.3DiedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agustín Gómez Cabezas y Sildo (VIAF: 88876454)
Bishop Agustín Gómez Cabezas y Sildo (born , died 1862) Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

EventPlace
Birth PlacePotosí
Ordained BishopSucre, Archdiocese of La Plata o Charcas

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 231
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 4
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 41, Number 2,619
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 91, Number 7,710

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast