Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Manuel García Naranjó

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1838Born
21 Dec 186729.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
11 Sep 190769.3SelectedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
16 Dec 190769.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
14 Jan 190869.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lima, Peru
10 Sep 191779.3DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Pedro Manuel García Naranjó
Archbishop Pedro Manuel García Naranjó (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • op/c1+: LB, 31 Jan 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1908, Number 6
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast