Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Galeazzi

Deceased

Bishop of Grosseto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1885Born
29 Jun 190923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Narni, Italy
16 Sep 193246.7AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
30 Oct 193246.8Ordained BishopBishop of Grosseto, Italy
10 Aug 197185.6DiedBishop of Grosseto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Galeazzi (VIAF: 88881115)
Bishop Paolo Galeazzi (born , died ) Bishop of Grosseto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSangemini

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1932, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast