Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Norbert Hans Christoph Foerster, S.V.D.

Bishop of Ji-Paraná, Rondonia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1960 Born
1985²24.4First VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
1989²28.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of the Divine Word
1989²28.4Perpetual VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
10 Dec 198929.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
2 Dec 202060.3AppointedBishop of Ji-Paraná, Rondonia, Brazil
27 Feb 202160.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ji-Paraná, Rondonia, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Norbert Hans Christoph Foerster
Bishop Norbert Hans Christoph Foerster S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Ji-Paraná

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBonn, Germany
Ordained BishopSão José, Cathedral, Ji-Paraná, Diocese of Ji-Paraná, Rondonia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ji-Paraná.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2020
  • prof/c1: CB, 2 Dec 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 30 Dec 2020
  • c3: CB, 27 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Feb 2021

Quantcast