Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Gabriel Fernandez

Bishop Emeritus of Quilon, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1925 Born
19 Mar 194923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Quilon, India
30 Jan 197852.3AppointedBishop of Quilon, India
14 May 197852.6Ordained BishopBishop of Quilon, India
16 Oct 200176.0RetiredBishop of Quilon, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gabriel Fernandez
Bishop Joseph Gabriel Fernandez (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Quilon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaruthurkulangara
Ordained BishopGrounds of, St. Louis School, Quilon, Diocese of Quilon

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Quilon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast