Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Falcinelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jesi, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1884Born
22 Dec 190622.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 Sep 193450.5AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
1 Nov 193450.6Ordained BishopBishop of Jesi, Italy
6 Nov 195268.7ResignedBishop of Jesi, Italy
6 Nov 195268.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
6 Jun 195975.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Jesi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Falcinelli
Archbishop Carlo Falcinelli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jesi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpoleto

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1934, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast