Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Estrada Solórzano

Bishop of Gómez Palacio, Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1961 Born
2 Jun 199533.7Ordained PriestPriest of México, Federal District
28 May 201351.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
28 May 201351.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Pinhel
19 Jul 201351.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pinhel
11 May 201957.7AppointedBishop of Gómez Palacio, Durango, México
3 Jul 201957.8InstalledBishop of Gómez Palacio, Durango, México

MicroData Summary for Jorge Estrada Solórzano
Bishop Jorge Estrada Solórzano (born ) Bishop of Gómez Palacio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMexico City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, Mexico City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gómez Palacio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 May 2013
  • ob: CB, 31 May 2013
  • c2+: CB, 19 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,838
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 May 2019
  • i: CB, 16 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast