Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Esser, O.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Keimoes, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1908Born
14 Mar 193728.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
13 Jan 194940.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Keetmanshoop, Namibia
13 Jan 194940.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Claneus
30 Mar 194940.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claneus
9 Jun 195546.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Keimoes, South Africa
12 Sep 196253.9SucceededBishop of Keimoes, South Africa
8 Dec 196658.1DiedBishop of Keimoes, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Esser
Bishop Francis Xavier Esser O.S.F.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Keimoes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOpladen, Germany

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1949, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast