Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emeterio Echeverria Barrena

Deceased

Prelate of Ciudad Real, Spain

Titular Bishop of Dora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1880Born
4 Apr 190424.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Dec 194262.8AppointedPrelate of Ciudad Real, Spain
29 Dec 194262.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dora
28 Mar 194363.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dora
23 Dec 195474.8DiedPrelate of Ciudad Real, Spain

MicroData Summary for Emeterio Echeverria Barrena
Bishop Emeterio Echeverria Barrena (born , died ) Prelate of Ciudad Real

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArlegui
Ordained BishopCathedral, Pamplona, Diocese of Pamplona

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1943, Number 16
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,681

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast