Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús María Echavarría y Aguirre

Deceased

Bishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1858Born
18 Oct 188628.2Ordained PriestPriest of Sinaloa, México
16 Dec 190446.4AppointedBishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México
12 Feb 190546.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México
27 Mar 190546.7InstalledBishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México
5 Apr 195495.7DiedBishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México

MicroData Summary for Jesús María Echavarría y Aguirre
Bishop Jesús María Echavarría y Aguirre (born , died ) Bishop of Saltillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBacubirito

  • a priest for 67.4 years
  • a bishop for 49.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1905, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast