Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Christian Ebert

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Erfurt-Meiningen, Germany

Titular Bishop of Druas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1916Born
23 Feb 194124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
20 Jul 197356.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Erfurt-Meiningen, Germany
20 Jul 197356.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Druas
15 Sep 197356.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Druas
12 Nov 197458.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Erfurt-Meiningen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Christian Ebert (VIAF: 5840064)
Bishop Karl Christian Ebert (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Erfurt-Meiningen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWürzburg
Ordained BishopChurch, Meiningen, Apostolic Administration of Erfurt-Meiningen

  • a priest for 33.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,294

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast