Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Leonard Doyle

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1929Born
12 Jun 195424.9Ordained PriestPriest of London, Ontario, Canada
24 May 197646.9AppointedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
28 Jun 197647.0Ordained BishopBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
14 Jul 197647.0InstalledBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
28 Dec 200273.5ResignedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
22 Apr 200474.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for James Leonard Doyle
Bishop James Leonard Doyle (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Peterborough

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChatham
Ordained BishopSt. Pierre, Cathedral, London, Diocese of London, Ontario

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 37, Number 2,244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast