Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Di Lieto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1912Born
1 Dec 193523.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Aug 195644.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
11 Aug 195644.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hirina
28 Oct 195644.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hirina
21 Nov 195745.6AppointedBishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
16 Apr 198775.0RetiredBishop of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy
31 May 198876.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Di Lieto
Bishop Mario Di Lieto (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmalfi

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Feb 2021

Quantcast