Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Maria della Camera

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Thermopylae

Auxiliary Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1837Born
25 May 186124.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 189355.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
16 Jan 189355.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
22 Jan 189355.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
19 Jun 192689.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Maria della Camera
Bishop Benedetto Maria della Camera (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Thermopylae

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorcone, Archdiocese of Benevento, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Pantaleone, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 65.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 548
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 6
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,804

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast