Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Maria Dalvit, F.S.C.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São Mateus, Espirito Santo, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Munatiana

Auxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1919Born
7 Oct 193718.0ProfessedMember of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
7 Oct 194223.0Perpetual VowsMember of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
10 Apr 194323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
9 May 195939.6AppointedBishop of São Mateus, Espirito Santo, Brazil
29 Jun 195939.7Ordained BishopBishop of São Mateus, Espirito Santo, Brazil
14 May 197050.6ResignedBishop of São Mateus, Espirito Santo, Brazil
14 May 197050.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sullectum
16 Mar 197151.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Sullectum
5 Oct 197354.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
5 Oct 197354.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Munatiana
17 Jan 197757.3DiedBishop Emeritus of São Mateus, Espirito Santo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Maria Dalvit
Bishop José Maria Dalvit F.S.C.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of São Mateus

EventPlace
Birth PlacePressano, Diocese of Trento, Italy
Ordained BishopVitória, Archdiocese of Vitória, Espirito Santo
Death PlaceSão Mateus, Diocese of São Mateus, Espirito Santo

  • a priest for 33.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1959, Number 60
  • ab/3s84: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 62, Page 540
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 696

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast