Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Felippe da Cunha, S.D.N. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guanhães, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1933Born
14 Jul 196330.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Dec 198552.6AppointedBishop of Guanhães, Minas Gerais, Brazil
6 Apr 198652.9Ordained BishopBishop of Guanhães, Minas Gerais, Brazil
8 Feb 199561.7ResignedBishop of Guanhães, Minas Gerais, Brazil
5 Mar 199561.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Guanhães, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Felippe da Cunha
Bishop Antônio Felippe da Cunha S.D.N. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guanhães

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInhapim
Ordained BishopManhumirim
Death PlaceBelo Horizonte, Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 98, Number 8,438
  • r/loc: CB, 2 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Sep 2021

Quantcast