Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Cohalan

Deceased

Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1884Born
9 Jun 190622.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cork, Ireland
30 Jan 194359.0AppointedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
4 Apr 194359.1Ordained BishopBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
27 Jan 196580.9DiedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Daniel Cohalan
Bishop Daniel Cohalan (born , died ) Bishop of Waterford and Lismore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilmichael

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1943, Number 18
  • opd: Website of the Diocese, 25 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast