Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Coen

Deceased

Bishop of Clonfert, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1766¹Born
30 Jun 179529.4Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 181650.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Clonfert, Ireland
26 Jan 181650.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Milevum
5 May 181650.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milevum
9 Oct 183165.7SucceededBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
25 Apr 184781.3DiedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Thomas Coen
Bishop Thomas Coen (born 1766, died ) Bishop of Clonfert

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFohena, Co. Galway
Ordained BishopSt. Brendan, Loughrea, Diocese of Clonfert
Buried Place (Original)Carmelite Abbey, Cemetery, Loughrea, Diocese of Clonfert

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 154, and Page 265
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,287
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast