Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Waldron

Deceased

Bishop of Killala, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1753¹Born
1778¹25.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 181461.7AppointedBishop of Killala, Ireland
24 Feb 181562.1Ordained BishopBishop of Killala, Ireland
20 May 183481.3DiedBishop of Killala, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Waldron
Bishop Peter Waldron (born 1753, died ) Bishop of Killala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCave, Ballyhaunis, Co. Mayo
Buried Place (Original)Crypt of unfinished, Cathedral, Ballina
Buried Place (Current)Graveyard north of the cemetery

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 6
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 68
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 128, and Page 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast