Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Choi Deok-hong (Choe, Tchoi)

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Taiku, Korea (South)

Titular Bishop of Anthedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1902Born
29 May 192623.8Ordained PriestPriest of Taiku, Korea (South)
9 Dec 194846.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Taiku, Korea (South)
9 Dec 194846.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Anthedon
30 Jan 194946.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anthedon
14 Dec 195452.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Taiku, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Choi Deok-hong (Choe, Tchoi)
Bishop John Baptist Choi Deok-hong (Choe, Tchoi) (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Taiku

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaiku

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1949, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast