Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Germain Mousset, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Taiku, Korea (South)

Titular Bishop of Irenopolis in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1876Born
24 Jun 190023.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
13 Dec 193862.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Taiku, Korea (South)
13 Dec 193862.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Isauria
7 May 193962.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Isauria
25 Oct 194266.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Taiku, Korea (South)
8 Jun 195780.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Taiku, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Jean-Germain Mousset
Bishop Jean-Germain Mousset M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Taiku

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Rambert-sur-Loire, France

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1939, Number 24
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 18, Number 962, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast