Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Carlos Chacorowski, C.M.

Bishop of Caraguatatuba, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1956 Born
16 Apr 198023.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
20 Apr 198023.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Mission
2 Jul 198023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
22 Dec 201053.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
22 Dec 201053.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae Nigrae
19 Feb 201154.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae Nigrae
19 Jun 201356.4AppointedBishop of Caraguatatuba, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Carlos Chacorowski
Bishop José Carlos Chacorowski C.M. (born ) Bishop of Caraguatatuba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuritiba, Archdiocese of Curitiba, Parana
Ordained PriestEstadio do Maracanã, Rio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
Ordained BishopParish Hall, Santo Antônio, Church, Curitiba, Archdiocese of Curitiba, Parana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caraguatatuba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,953
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast