Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karel Celik

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Banjaluka, Bosnia and Herzegovina

Titular Bishop of Dionysias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1894Born
17 Jun 191622.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 195157.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Banjaluka, Bosnia and Herzegovina
15 Dec 195157.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysias
16 Dec 195157.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysias
11 Aug 195864.5DiedApostolic Administrator of Banjaluka, Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Karel Celik
Bishop Karel Celik (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Banjaluka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSlimena
Ordained BishopBeograd, Archdiocese of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1955
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1959
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1951, Number 118
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 32, Number 1,810

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast