Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Annibaldo Cardinal di Ceccano

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1280¹Born
5 May 132646.3AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
18 Dec 132747.9Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 132747.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
23 Dec 132747.9ResignedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
1333²53.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
1342²62.0AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
17 Jul 1350²70.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Annibaldo di Ceccano
Annibaldo Cardinal di Ceccano (born 1280, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastello, Ceccano
Death PlaceS. Giorgio, Castle, Monte Cassino
Buried Place (Original)Ss. Lorenzo e Giorgio Chapel, San Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 22.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 23 Dec 2020

Quantcast