Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Cattaneo

Deceased

Bishop of Guastalla, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1853Born
Jul 1880³27.4Ordained PriestPriest of Crema, Italy
15 Mar 191057.1AppointedBishop of Guastalla, Italy
10 Apr 191057.2Ordained BishopBishop of Guastalla, Italy
9 Apr 192370.2DiedBishop of Guastalla, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Cattaneo
Bishop Agostino Cattaneo (born , died ) Bishop of Guastalla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrema, Diocese of Crema
Ordained BishopCrema, Diocese of Crema

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1910, Number 16
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,917

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast